IL SB1739 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. In provisions relating to business income of persons other than residents, for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 2008, provides that the sales factor for receipts from the sale of broadcasting services is determined based on audience or subscribers located in Illinois or, if that cannot be determined, by place of publication. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-SALES FACTOR-BROADCAST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0763 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 037-017-000 | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Withdrawn Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg; to Non-Concur | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-05-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Non-Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-05-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-11 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-05-11 | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-05 | First Reading | |
2009-05-04 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-05-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-30 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-30 | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Schoenberg | |
2009-04-30 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Postponed - Revenue | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Revenue | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |