IL SB1711 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Cancer Clinical Trial Participation Program Act. Presents the findings of the General Assembly. Provides that an independent third-party organization may develop and implement a cancer clinical trial participation program to provide reimbursement to subjects for ancillary costs associated with participation in a cancer clinical trial. Requires the program to collaborate with physicians, health care providers, and cancer clinical trial sponsors to notify a prospective subject about the program, reimburse subjects based on financial need, and provide reimbursement for ancillary costs. Provides that an organization administering the program shall provide written notice to prospective subjects of the requirements. Provides that reimbursement under the program at a trial site that conducts cancer clinical trials must be reviewed and approved by the institutional review board associated with the cancer clinical trial for which the reimbursement is provided and that an organization operating the program is not required to obtain approval from an institutional review board on the financial eligibility of a subject who is medically eligible for the program. Requires an organization operating the program to provide subjects with specified written notice. Provides that reimbursement to a subject of ancillary costs under the program does not constitute an undue inducement to participate in a cancer clinical trial and is not considered coercion or the exertion of undue influence to participate in a cancer clinical trial. Allows an organization that administers the program to accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source to implement the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CANCER TRIAL PARTICIPATION PGM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0619 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date December 20, 2019 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 011-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Waive Posting Notice On Motion |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 12, 2019 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-10-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-10-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 6-103.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |