IL SB1707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Provides that all persons providing medical cannabis related services under the Act for a cultivation center shall hold certification as a Certified Medical Cannabis Cultivation Center Agent. Provides that all persons providing medical cannabis related services under the Act for a dispensing organization shall hold certification as a Certified Medical Cannabis Dispensing Organization Agent or Dispensing Organization Agent.
Title
MEDICAL CANNABIS PILOT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1024 |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-009-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-01-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-002-000 |
2017-08-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-08-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-08-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-08-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-08-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-08-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-08-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-08-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-08-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017 |
2017-08-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-08-16 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-004-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-29 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-004-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-001-000 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Public Health |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 130 | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |