IL SB1707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Provides that all persons providing medical cannabis related services under the Act for a cultivation center shall hold certification as a Certified Medical Cannabis Cultivation Center Agent. Provides that all persons providing medical cannabis related services under the Act for a dispensing organization shall hold certification as a Certified Medical Cannabis Dispensing Organization Agent or Dispensing Organization Agent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL CANNABIS PILOT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-29HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-29HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-29HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-26HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-004-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-001-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-07SenateRe-referred to Public Health
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410130105Amended CodeCitation Text
410130130Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback