IL SB1705 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Hearing: Oct 24 @ 3:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Adds families that are not recipients of benefits under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program and that need child care assistance to participate in education and training activities to the list of family categories that are covered under the child care assistance program. Deletes a provision: requiring the Department of Human Services to allocate $7,500,000 annually for a test program for families that are income-eligible for child care assistance, are not recipients of TANF, and need child care assistance to participate in education and training activities; and requiring the Department to specify the conditions of eligibility for the test program. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD CARE-EDUCATION/TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-09HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-012-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-004-000
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30559A-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback