IL SB1705 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a court may stay the execution on a money judgment, if the judgment debtor furnishes the judgment creditor with the required amount of security. Provides that the required amount of security is the lesser of: the sum of the judgment, interest pending appeal, and costs; 25% of the judgment debtor's net worth; or $25 million. Provides that a court may lower the required amount of security if a judgment debtor shows that the debtor is likely to sustain substantial economic harm if required to post the required security. Provides that a court may increase the required amount of security if a judgment creditor shows that a judgment debtor who obtained a stay is dissipating assets or diverting assets outside of the United States in other than the ordinary course of business. Provides that an appellate court may review the required amount of security, but may not increase it above the statutory limit. Provides that the new provisions apply to any action in which a money judgment is entered after the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-STAY MONEY JUDGMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-10 | Senate | To Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil Process and Procedure |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-1306 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 2-1307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1705&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1705.htm |