IL SB1693 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that the death certificate for an individual with a history of military service may include or may be amended to include the deceased individual's veteran status, the branch of the military that he or she served in, and the period of time that he or she served in the military. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VITAL RECORDS-MILITARY SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-26SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-26SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41053511Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback