IL SB1681 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Line of Duty Compensation Act. Includes probation officers within the scope of the Act.
Title
LINE OF DUTY-PROBATION OFFICER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0221 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 315 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |