IL SB1672 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an insurance company offering homeowner's insurance coverage or renter's insurance coverage that issues a policy or contract insuring against liability for injury to a person or injury to or destruction of property arising out of the ownership, lease, or rental of residential property shall, to the best of their ability, for any claim involving a dog-related incident, record specified circumstances relating to the incident. Provides that the information shall be collected for a 2-year period beginning on January 1, 2022 and shall be reported annually to the Department of Insurance. Requires the Department to make the information available on the Department's website by July 1, 2023 and update the information each July 1 through July 1, 2024. Provides that the information or data collected by the Department shall not be released or published in any way that violates the confidentiality or proprietary status or nature of the data.
Title
HOMEOWNER'S LIABILITY INS-DOGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0328 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Holmes |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |