IL SB1667 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Act. Provides that the Governor is authorized and requested to address businesses, park districts, other special recreational districts of the State, and governmental personnel, in addition to the citizens of the State, in making a yearly proclamation taking public notice of Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOV: SAFETY DAY PROCLAMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6256020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback