IL SB1666 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Adds, to the circumstances under which endangering the life or health of a child is a Class 3 felony for which the person, if sentenced to a term of imprisonment, shall be sentenced to a term of not less than 2 years and not more than 10 years, the following: that the violation is the proximate cause of great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement of the child; or that the violation occurs while the person is committing or attempting to commit another offense that is a felony or a Class A misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-CHILD ENDANGERMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-03-09 | Senate | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Held in Criminal Law |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-21.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |