IL SB1666 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - To Subcommittee on Special Issues
Pending: Senate Judiciary Special Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Thermal Energy Network and Jobs Acts. Sets forth a statement of legislative findings and intent. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Defines "thermal energy" and "thermal energy network". Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall initiate a proceeding within 3 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act to support the development of thermal energy networks. Specifies the matters the Commission shall consider in such proceeding. Provides that the Commission shall adopt rules within 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act to do specified tasks. Provides for procedures for submittal of proposed pilot thermal energy network projects with the Commission. Provides that each gas, electric, or combination gas and utility corporation shall report to the Commission, on a quarterly basis and until completion of the pilot thermal energy network project, the status of each project. Provides that any thermal energy network created shall demonstrate that the gas, electric, or combination gas and electric corporation has entered into a labor peace agreement with a bona fide labor organization of jurisdiction that is actively engaged in representing gas and electric corporation employees. Makes corresponding changes to the Act and the Illinois Power Agency Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

THERMAL ENERGY NETWORK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues
2024-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues
2024-01-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2024-01-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2024-01-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive
2024-01-10SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2023-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2023-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2023-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2023-02-23SenateTo Executive Subcommittee on Special Issues
2023-02-21SenateAssigned to Executive
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2038551-83New CodeSee Bill Text
22053-101Amended CodeCitation Text
22053-105Amended CodeCitation Text
22053-127New CodeSee Bill Text
22053-128New CodeSee Bill Text
22058-513New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback