IL SB1665 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act concerning the Prescription Monitoring Program. Provides that beginning on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a licensed veterinarian shall be exempt from registration and prohibited from accessing patient information in the Prescription Monitoring Program. Provides that licensed veterinarians that are existing registrants shall be removed from the Prescription Monitoring Program. Exempts licensed veterinarians from the reporting requirements of the Program. Provides that if a person who is presenting an animal for treatment is suspected of fraudulently obtaining any controlled substance or prescription for a controlled substance, the licensed veterinarian shall report that information to the local law enforcement agency. Removes veterinarian members from the Prescription Monitoring Program Advisory Committee and the Peer Review Committee. Effective immediately.
Title
PMP-LICENSED VETERINARIANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0414 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-001-000 |
2019-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 314.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |