IL SB1657 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Third Reading - Lost; 023-027-002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Third Reading - Lost; 023-027-002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for any employer, employment agency, or labor organization to inquire into or use the fact of an arrest that did not result in a conviction, the fact of a criminal charge that did not result in a conviction, or criminal history record information ordered expunged, sealed or impounded under the Criminal Identification Act as a basis to refuse to hire, to segregate, or to act with respect to recruitment, hiring, promotion, renewal of employment, selection for training or apprenticeship, discharge, discipline, tenure or terms, privileges or conditions of employment (rather than the fact of an arrest or criminal history record information). Also provides that the prohibition against the use of the fact of an arrest or the fact of a criminal charge shall not be construed to prohibit an employer, employment agency, or labor organization from obtaining or using other information which indicates that a person actually engaged in the conduct for which he or she was arrested.
Title
HUMAN RTS-EMPLOYMENT DISCRIM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Lost; 023-027-002 | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 005-002-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-03-05 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Constitutional Review | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |