IL SB1630 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a county may petition the circuit court to have property declared abandoned if the county's petition specifies that the property is not being maintained as shown by the county having to abate a violation more than 3 times within a 12 month period. Provides that a county may transfer an irregular public parcel at no cost to adjoining property owners after receiving no bids after a public auction or no offers after adopting a resolution to sell the irregular public parcel. Defines "irregular public parcel". Amends the Illinois Municipal Code to make similar changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ABANDONED-IRREGULAR PARCELS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0269 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date August 4, 2015 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 045-007-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-007-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-037-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-05-20 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-20 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Counties & Townships Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-05-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-05-20 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; LaHood |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-31-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-76-4.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |