IL SB1624 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personal Information Protection Act. Provides that a data collector required to report breaches to more than 100 Illinois residents as a result of a single breach must also report to the Attorney General. Provides that the Attorney General shall report to the General Assembly specified information concerning breaches of data security by February 1 of each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONAL INFORMATION REPORT GA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 010-002-000
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Telecommunications and Information Technology; 006-000-000
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 008-000-000
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
81553010Amended CodeCitation Text
81553055New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback