IL SB1622 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that no voting machine used, adopted, or purchased by an election authority may be made, manufactured, or assembled outside the United States or constructed with parts made, manufactured, or assembled outside the United States, including, but not limited to, any hardware or software. In provisions concerning voting machines, precinct tabulation optical scan technology voting systems, and direct recording electronic voting systems, provides that the State Board of Elections shall not approve any voting equipment or system that is made, manufactured, or assembled outside the United States or constructed with parts made, manufactured, or assembled outside the United States, including, but not limited to, any hardware or software.
Title
ELEC CD-VOTING MACHINES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 24-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 24A-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24B-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24C-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1622&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1622.htm |