IL SB1609 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that beginning April 1, 2012, and each year thereafter, the Illinois Power Agency shall prepare a report for the General Assembly and Illinois Commerce Commission that shall include, but not be limited to, renewable portfolio standards. Provides that a required annual report shall include the quantity, price, and rate impact of all renewable resources purchased pursuant to long-term contracts under the electricity procurement plans for electric utilities. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that beginning April 1, 2012 and by April 1 of each year thereafter, the Illinois Power Agency shall submit an annual report to the General Assembly, the Commission, and alternative retail electric suppliers that shall include specified information. Effective immediately.
Title
IL PWR AGCY-RATE TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Rep. Marlow Colvin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0669 |
2012-01-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 13, 2012 |
2012-01-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2011-11-29 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments; |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 29, 2011 |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2011-11-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-11-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2011-11-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-11-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-11-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-11-10 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2011 |
2011-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-012-000 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy; 017-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115D | Amended Code | Citation Text |