IL SB1608 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Penalty and Interest Act. Provides that provisions imposing a penalty of $100 for failure to file a transaction reporting return under the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act or the Use Tax Act apply only to transaction reporting returns that would not, when properly prepared and filed, result in the imposition of a tax (currently, those provisions apply regardless of whether a tax would be imposed). Provides that transaction reporting returns that would result in the imposition of a tax when properly prepared and filed are subject to the standard penalty for failure to file (2% of the tax required to be shown due on the return, up to a maximum amount of $250). Effective immediately.
Title
UPIA-FAILURE TO FILE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0335 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 051-001-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-001-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-04-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported Back To Revenue; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (RV) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 735 | 3-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |