IL SB1597 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Compostable Bags in Retail Establishments Act. Provides that no retail establishment in the State shall use or provide polyethylene or other non-compostable plastic film bags tinted green or brown for customers to bag products in stores, as carry out bags, or for home delivery. Provides that any film bags meeting the definition of compostable that retail establishments provide to customers for food or other products, such as vegetables bagged in stores prior to checkout, must be tinted green or brown and shall be clearly labeled "COMPOSTABLE", including language following the Federal Trade Commission's "Green Guides". Provides that no film bag that retail establishments provide to customers to bag products in stores, as carry out bags, or for home delivery may be labeled with the term "biodegradable", "degradable", "decomposable", or any similar terms, or in any way imply that the product will break down, fragment, biodegrade, or decompose in a landfill or other environment. Defines "carry out bag", "compostable", and "retail establishment". Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPOSTABLE BAGS-RETAIL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-001-000
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback