IL SB1596 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Includes, as a hate crime, the commission of the specified criminal acts against a person because of the actual or perceived citizenship or immigration status of the person. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-HATE CRIME-IMMIGRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0235 |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-05-10 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Criminal Law- Clear Compliance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |