IL SB1584 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pesticide Act. Changes the product registration fee to $600 per 2-year registration period (currently, $300 per product per year). Changes the business registration fee to $800 per 2-year registration period (currently, $400 per year). Changes the penalty for late registration to $100 per product in addition to the regular product registration fee (currently, $400 per product in lieu of the normal registration fee). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PESTICIDE REGISTRATION FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 60 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 60 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |