IL SB1579 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if a veteran with a surviving spouse was in the process of review to receive the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities, but the veteran died before the exemption was approved, then the application process shall continue and any subsequent approval granted to the veteran shall carry over to the spouse as long as the spouse meets the requirements for carry over.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-27 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-14 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-14 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-14 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |