IL SB1576 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that upon a declaration by the Governor that an emergency harvest situation exists, a special permit issued by the Department of Transportation shall be required from September 1 through December 31 during harvest season emergencies for a vehicle that exceeds the maximum axle weight and gross limits or a vehicle that exceeds its registered gross weight, provided that the vehicle's axle weight and gross weight do not both exceed 10% above the maximum specified limits, and does not exceed the vehicle's registered gross weight by 10%. Provides that all other restrictions that apply to permits issued shall apply during the declared time period and no fee shall be charged for the issuance of those permits. Provides that the permits issued by the Department are only valid on federal and State highways under the jurisdiction of the Department, except interstate highways. Provides that with respect to highways under the jurisdiction of local authorities, the local authorities may, at their discretion, waive special permit requirements during harvest season emergencies, and set a divisible load weight limit not to exceed 10% of a vehicle's registered gross weight, provided that the vehicle's axle weight and gross weight do not exceed 10% above the maximum specified limits. Provides that any vehicle operating under an emergency harvest permit shall not be in violation of a Section concerning the effect of provisions within the original and renewal of registration Article of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-EXCESS WEIGHT AG EXEMPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-23HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-301Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-401Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback