IL SB1562 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Creates the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act Revisionary Task Force. Provides that the purpose of the Task Force is to conduct a thorough review of the implementation of Public Act 100-987, study the municipal administrative adjudication process, and make recommendations for revisions. Provides requirements for: appointment of members; compensation; administrative support; and reporting. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2024 (instead of January 1, 2022). Makes a corresponding change in the Clerks of Courts Act. Effective immediately.
Title
COURT ASSESSMENT TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 1-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 135 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1562&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1562.htm |