IL SB1530 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Services Lien Act. Adds to the definition of "health care provider" ambulatory surgical treatment facilities accredited by one of the following organizations: the American Association for the Accreditation of Ambulatory Surgical Facilities; the Joint Commission (formerly the Joint Commission on Accreditation of Healthcare Organizations); the Healthcare Facilities Accreditation Program; or the Accreditation Association for Ambulatory Health Care.
Title
LIENS-AMBULATORY SURGICAL CTRS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
770 | 23 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |