IL SB1524 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Creates the Student Investment Account Act (currently, the Student Loan Investment Act). Adds a provision concerning the use of earnings from the Student Investment Account. Modifies provisions concerning the establishment, operation, and administration of the Student Investment Account by the State Treasurer, and adds requirements concerning income share agreements and income share agreement providers. Allows the State Treasurer to enter into income share agreements with participants (currently, borrowers) and to facilitate such arrangements between participants and eligible income share agreement providers (currently, lenders). Provides that the State Treasurer or his or her designee (currently, only State Treasurer) may charge and collect insurance premiums under the Act. Provides for the creation and use of specified Funds as non-appropriated separate and apart trust funds in the State Treasury (currently, Funds to be held outside of the State Treasury with the State Treasurer as custodian). Amends the Student Loan Servicing Rights Act. Provides that the term "student loan servicer" does not include, among other entities, the State Treasurer (currently, the State Treasurer and its agents when the agents are acting on the State Treasurer's behalf). Modifies and defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
IL STUDENT LOAN INVESTMENT ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0586 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2019 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Financial Institutions |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-044-001 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-007-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 992 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 520 | 22.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |