IL SB1506 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides the Secretary the State shall designate a space on each instruction permit for persons 18 years of age or older, instruction permit for a minor, or driver's license where, at the request of the applicant, the words "mental disability" shall be placed and shall offer to each applicant an option to place the designation on his or her permit or driver's license. Provides the acceptable forms of proof for eligibility of the designation shall include a verified written statement from a medical specialist, a licensed physician assistant, or a licensed advanced practice nurse or any other proof the Secretary deems necessary. Defines "mental disability".
Title
VEH CD-MENTAL DISABILITY-ID
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-107.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1506&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1506.htm |