IL SB1492 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that an individual who, for the purpose of obtaining benefits, knowingly provides false, incomplete, or misleading information commits unemployment security benefits fraud. Provides that unemployment insurance security benefits fraud is a felony. Requires a statement on the Department of Employment Security's website and on specified forms stating that it is a crime to knowingly provide false, incomplete, or misleading information to any party to an unemployment security benefits transaction for the purpose of committing fraud and outlines possible penalties. Provides that an employer or other person that law enforcement or the Department of Employment Security requests information from regarding unemployment insurance fraud shall take all reasonable actions to promptly provide the information requested and shall disclose information when he or she has a reasonable belief of a specified violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMPLOY INS-FRAUD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LB)
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820405901Amended CodeCitation Text
820405902New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback