IL SB1490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Unemployment Insurance Act prohibiting the disclosure of information obtained from an individual or employing unit during the administration of the Act. In language providing that the prohibition does not apply to communication with an individual or entity through unencrypted e-mail or unencrypted electronic means as long as the communication does not contain the individual's or entity's name in combination with specified numbers or codes, deletes "account number" from the numbers and codes. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMP INS-INFO DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 1900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1490&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1490.htm |