IL SB1484 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Designates the third Saturday in September of each year as "Preventing Lost Potential Day", to be observed throughout the State as a day set apart to provide a new focus on the importance of and dedication to educate, encourage, protect, and develop our State's youth. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMEM DATES-LOST POTENTIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0066 |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Effective Date July 16, 2015 |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Youth & Young Adults; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-27 | House | Assigned to Youth & Young Adults |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2015 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs; |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |