IL SB1484 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987. Replaces the requirement for licensees to apply for additional licenses in order to practice optometry at more than one address with the new requirement that licensees report to the Department every additional location where the licensee engages in the practice of optometry. Provides that failure to report a practice location or registering a location where a licensee does not practice constitutes a violation of the Act. In a provision concerning license renewal, provides that all licensees on March 31, 2010 without a certification of completion of an oral pharmaceutical course as required by the Act shall be placed on non-renewed status and may only be renewed after the licensee meets those requirements established by the Department. Provides that licensees may apply for expungement from their disciplinary record any offense relating to the failure to complete continuing education requirements, the failure to have an ancillary license, or the failure to report a practice location if they meet certain conditions. Repeals a Section concerning limited optometry licenses. Makes other changes.
Title
IL OPTOMETRIC PRACTICE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2009 | |
2009-03-06 | Do Pass Consumer Protection; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Consumer Protection | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |