IL SB1482 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Education for Homeless Children Act. Provides that the State Board of Education may by rule establish limits on the duration and extent of agreements for the transport of a homeless child to the school district of origin after the homeless child begins living in another school district.
Title
HOMELESS CHILD SCH TRANSIT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 007-004-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 45 | 1-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |