IL SB1478 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Special Committee on Watercraft Safety |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Re-assigned to Special Committee on Watercraft Safety |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 7, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ST) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |