IL SB1456 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides the term "pollution control facility" does not include the portion of a site or facility for which a permit application is submitted to the Environmental Protection Agency to modify an existing permit for the transfer of landscape waste to also include, on a demonstration basis not to exceed 24 months each time a permit is issued, the transfer of commingled landscape waste and food scrap or for which a permit application is submitted to the Agency within 6 months after the effective date (currently, January 1, 2016). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-POLLUTION CONTROL FACILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41553.32Amended CodeCitation Text
41553.330Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback