IL SB1444 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0483
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0483
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Acupuncture Practice Act. Allows an invited guest acupuncturist from another state or country to engage in professional education if he or she is currently licensed in another state or country and has an active, undisciplined license, or he or she is currently certified in good standing as an acupuncturist by the National Certification Commission for Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine (instead of requiring both components). Effective immediately.
Title
ACUPUNCTURE LIC-GUEST INSTRUCT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0483 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date August 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Re-assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2009 | |
2009-03-06 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |