IL SB1429 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Chicago Metropolitan Agency for Planning to fulfill its obligations under the Regional Planning Act, to enhance capacity to support additional comprehensive local and regional planning, and to facilitate access to federal funding. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$CMAP-VARIOUS FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Public Safety and Infrastructure |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1429&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/PDF/10300SB1429.pdf |