IL SB1427 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Extends the repeal date for provisions concerning a program that allows individuals 18 years of age or older to purchase lottery tickets online from July 1, 2017 to July 1, 2022. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-INTERNET PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-21HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-06-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-23HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-19HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-05-19HouseArrived in House
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-007-001
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Syverson
2017-05-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Gaming; 011-001-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenatePostponed - Gaming
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Gaming
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016057.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback