IL SB1417 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that the fire chief of any fire protection district may fix, charge, and collect fees associated with the fire department extinguishing an open burning that is prohibited due to atmospheric or other conditions. Provides that the fee may be imposed against any person causing or engaging in the prohibited activity, or the owner of the property on which the open burning took place. Provides that the total amount collected to compensate the fire protection district shall be assessed in accordance with both the rates provided in another Section of the Act and the fire chief's determination of the cost of personnel and equipment utilized to extinguish the fire. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE PROTECTION OPEN BURNING
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Noland [D] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0279 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | House | Assigned to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Noland |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 011-001-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-004-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 8.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |