IL SB1411 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that a public adjuster may not charge, agree to, or accept any compensation, payment, commissions, fee, or other valuable consideration in excess of 10% of the amount of the insurance settlement claim paid by the insurer.
Title
INS CD-PUBLIC ADJUSTER FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Insurance |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 1570 | Amended Code | Citation Text |