IL SB1410 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Permits the governing body to approve a supplemental appropriation ordinance, but only with respect to additional revenue that becomes available to the Park District or is estimated to be received by the Park District subsequent to the adoption of the annual appropriation ordinance for that fiscal year. Provides that publication, notice, and hearing requirements are not applicable to the supplemental ordinance and the budget document forming the basis of that ordinance. Effective immediately.
Title
PARKS ANNUAL APPROPRIATION
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0278 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-049-001 |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-014-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-003-000 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 4-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |