IL SB1408 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the 2020 federal decennial census of population.
Title
$DCEO-CENSUS APPROPRIATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1408&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB1408.pdf |