IL SB1405 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for a person who is a resident in a facility licensed under the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013 or the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act for whom payments are made throughout a month and who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance, the State shall pay an amount in addition to the minimum monthly personal needs allowance authorized under the Social Security Act so that the person's total monthly personal needs allowance from both State and federal sources equals $100. Provides that any additional income needed by facilities for the purpose of providing adequate care shall be supplemented by the State; and that the personal needs allowance shall increase annually at the same rate as the Social Security cost-of-living adjustment to take effect on January 1 of each following year. Effective immediately.
Title
PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE $100
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-004-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1405&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1405.htm |