IL SB1405 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Funds Consolidation Act. Creates the State Funds Consolidation Board that shall: (i) review and analyze the current structure of the State's funds held in the State Treasury; (ii) review the Auditor General's finding regarding the excessive number of State funds that are held by the State; (iii) review specific funds to determine if it would be beneficial to the State to consolidate certain funds into existing or new funds; and (iv) report any recommendations to the General Assembly, the State Comptroller, the Governor, and the State Treasurer on an annual basis. Provides for the membership of the Board. Repeals the Act on June 30, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE FUNDS CONSOLIDATION ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] |
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. Scott Drury [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |