IL SB1404 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System by members of the Senate to persons who become participants before June 1, 2018 and provides that, beginning on that date, the System shall not accept any new participants who are members of the Senate. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GARS-NEW SENATE MEMBERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1404&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1404.htm |