IL SB1390 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the manufacturing and assembling machinery and equipment exemption includes production related tangible personal property. Provides that a Manufacturer's Purchase Credit may not be taken on or after July 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1390&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1390.htm |