IL SB1376 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois (Department of Transportation Law). Provides that the Department of Transportation is authorized to exercise those powers necessary for the State to qualify for rail assistance funds pursuant to relevant federal or State legislation (rather than pursuant to provisions of the federal Regional Rail Reorganization Act of 1973, the Railroad Revitalization and Regulatory Reform Act of 1976, or other relevant federal or State legislation). Provides that the Department is authorized to review all impending rail abandonments and provide its recommendations on those abandonments to the federal Surface Transportation Board (rather than to the Interstate Commerce Commission). Removes a requirement for the Department to report results of a review of the effects of all rail freight service assistance to the General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOT-RAIL ASSISTANCE-POWERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Transportation; 016-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-400Amended CodeCitation Text
2027052705-430Amended CodeCitation Text
20270549.25aAmended CodeCitation Text
20270549.25gAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback