IL SB1367 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that certain requirements concerning mileage reimbursement do not apply to agencies under the jurisdiction of the Governor's Travel Control Board. Provides that for agencies under the jurisdiction of the Governor's Travel Control Board, mileage reimbursement rates for automobile travel using an employee's personal vehicle for State business shall be established by the Governor's Travel Control Board and adjusted periodically at the advisement of the Department of Central Management Services. Provides that rates shall be based on a formula considering the fluctuations in vehicle and vehicle operating costs and the cost to operate a State vehicle, but in any event will not exceed the rate in effect under regulations pursuant to federal law. Requires the rates to be reviewed at least once per year. Requires the Board to formalize and approve the formula for determining its mileage rate adjustment recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-MILEAGE REIMBURSEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3010512-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback