IL SB1341 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Director of Corrections shall not award good conduct credit for meritorious service to an inmate unless the inmate has served a minimum of 60 days in the custody of the Department of Corrections. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-MERITORIOUS GOOD TIME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e) |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |