IL SB1328 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the $25 assessment for drug related offenses appropriated to and administered by the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall be distributed to fund Department of State Police drug task forces and Metropolitan Enforcement Groups by dividing the funds equally by the total number of Department of State Police drug task forces and Illinois Metropolitan Enforcement Groups.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-DRUG OFFENS ASSESSMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-29HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-9-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback